KY SB76 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Status: Enrolled on February 28 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [MS Word]
Summary
Reclassify Pikeville in Pike County, population 6,419, from a city of the third class to a city of the fourth class. As provided in Section 156A of the Kentucky Constitution, the population requirements for the classification established by the former Section 156 of the Kentucky Constitution remain in effect until changed by law. Therefore, classification of a city of the fourth class requires a population of 3,000 to 7,999.
Title
AN ACT changing the classification of the City of Pikeville, in Pike County.
Sponsors
Sen. Ray Jones [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | signed by Governor | |
2011-02-28 | delivered to Governor | |
2011-02-28 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2011-02-28 | received in Senate | |
2011-02-25 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 | |
2011-02-24 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, February 25, 2011 | |
2011-02-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar | |
2011-02-18 | posted in committee | |
2011-02-17 | to Local Government (H) | |
2011-02-16 | received in House | |
2011-02-15 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 | |
2011-02-15 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 15, 2011 | |
2011-02-10 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2011-02-09 | returned to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-09 | 1st reading | |
2011-02-09 | taken from State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-02-01 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2011-01-07 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB76.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/11RS/SB76/bill.doc |