KY SB82 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 108)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 108)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #5) [MS Word]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 141 to permit a contribution to be made to the pediatric cancer research trust fund to be made via a tax refund designation; require the designation to be printed on the face of the individual income tax form; require a description of the trust fund in the individual income tax return instructions; require the Revenue Cabinet to transfer the funds designated to the pediatric cancer research trust fund; Create new sections of KRS Chapter 211 to establish the trust fund, the trust fund board, and duties of the board.
Title
AN ACT relating to an income tax checkoff for the pediatric cancer research trust fund, and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. George Wise [R] | Sen. Ralph Alvarado [R] | Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
Sen. Jimmy Higdon [R] | Sen. Morgan McGarvey [D] | Sen. Dennis Parrett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 108) |
2015-03-25 | House | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-25 | House | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-25 | House | Bill passed 37-0 |
2015-03-25 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | Free Conference Committee report filed in Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | Bill passed 100-0 |
2015-03-25 | House | Free Conference Committee report adopted in House |
2015-03-24 | House | Free Conference Committee report filed in House |
2015-03-24 | House | Free Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Conference Committee report adopted in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Conference Committee report filed in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | Conference Committee appointed in House and Senate |
2015-03-24 | House | House refused to recede from floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2015-03-24 | House | posted for passage for receding from House floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2015-03-24 | House | to Rules (H) |
2015-03-24 | House | received in House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate refused to concur in House floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | passed over |
2015-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2015-03-10 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-10 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 with floor amendments (1) and (2-title) |
2015-03-09 | House | floor amendments (1) (2-title) and (3) filed |
2015-03-09 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2015-03-04 | House | placed in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 6, 2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | taken from Rules |
2015-03-03 | House | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a Consent Bill |
2015-03-02 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-02 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | posted in committee |
2015-02-23 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2015-02-12 | House | received in House |
2015-02-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 34-0 with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 12, 2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-10 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2015-01-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |