KY SB90 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-25 - recommitted to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-02-25 - recommitted to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 382.335 to require that certain filings include certification that they contain no Social Security numbers; hold clerks harmless from liability if an instrument not in compliance is filed.
Title
AN ACT relating to the recording of instruments by county clerks.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Seum [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-25 | recommitted to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-02-18 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-17 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (1-title) | |
2010-01-19 | to State & Local Government (S) | |
2010-01-14 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB90.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB90/bill.doc |