KY SCR135 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-09 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 71)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Recognize Kentucky Educational Television (KET) and encourage all cable and satellite providers to offer KET programming to their customers.
Title
Recognize Kentucky Educational Television (KET) and encourage all cable and satellite providers to offer KET programming to their customers.
Sponsors
Sen. Stan Humphries [R] | Sen. Denise Harper Angel [D] | Sen. Gerald Neal [D] | Sen. Dorsey Ridley [D] |
Sen. Johnny Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-09 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 71) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2016-03-29 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2016-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2016-03-25 | Senate | received in Senate |
2016-03-25 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2016-03-23 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Friday, March 25, 2016 |
2016-03-23 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-22 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2016-03-18 | House | posted in committee |
2016-03-10 | House | to Education (H) |
2016-03-09 | House | received in House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 8, 2016 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-03-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-02-22 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SCR135.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SC135/bill.pdf |