KY SCR46 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create the Alzheimer's and Dementia Workforce Assessment Task Force to study the state's healthcare workforce needs as well as the state's long-term care services and supports infrastructure, including long-term care facilities that are used to provide care to individuals diagnosed with Alzheimer's or dementia; outline task force membership; require the task force to meet monthly during the 2019 Interim and to submit findings and recommendations to the Legislative Research Commission by December 1, 2019.
Title
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION establishing the Alzheimer's and Dementia Workforce Assessment Task Force.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs 1, sfa 1 RSN# 815 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2019-03-06 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 7, 2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-04 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-28 | House | posted in committee |
2019-02-21 | House | to Health and Family Services (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | received in House |
2019-02-19 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) and floor amendment (1) |
2019-02-15 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2019-02-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 19, 2019 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-13 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2019-01-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Diseases
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Labor and Industry
Legislative Research Commission
Nurses
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch
Hospitals and Nursing Homes
Labor and Industry
Legislative Research Commission
Nurses
Occupations and Professions
Physicians and Practitioners
Studies Directed
Task Forces, Legislative Branch