KY SJR170 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 199)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 199)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Council on Postsecondary Education to conduct a study on expanding postbaccalaureate program offerings at comprehensive universities; and directs the council to consult with each president of a comprehensive university to consider a regional economic development or workforce development need that may be met by a postbaccalaureate program.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION directing the Council on Postsecondary Education to conduct a feasibility study on expanding postbaccalaureate program offerings at comprehensive universities.
Sponsors
Sen. David Givens [R] | Sen. Mike Wilson [R] | Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Robert Stivers [R] |
Sen. Damon Thayer [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Adopt FINAL W/ hcs1 RSN# 3242 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 463 (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Adopt RSN# 2995 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 463 (Y: 85 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Adopt RSN# 2995 (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts Ch. 199) |
2024-04-15 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-15 | Senate | adopted 37-0 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2024-04-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-04-12 | House | 3rd reading, adopted with Committee Substitute (1) 85-7 |
2024-03-27 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-27 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-03-26 | House | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute , floor amendment (2-title) filed to bill |
2024-03-26 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-22 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2024-03-22 | House | 2nd reading |
2024-03-22 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2024-03-21 | House | returned to Education (H) |
2024-03-21 | House | 1st reading |
2024-03-21 | House | taken from Education (H) |
2024-03-15 | House | to Education (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-13 | House | received in House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | 3rd reading, adopted 28-9-1 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 12, 2024 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-07 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-02-26 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-22 | Senate | introduced in Senate |