KY SR100 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - adopted 34-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-10 - adopted 34-0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm the reappointment of Raymond Malcolm Burse to the University of Louisville Board of Trustees for a term expiring January 13, 2025.
Title
A RESOLUTION confirming the reappointment of Raymond Malcolm Burse to the University of Louisville Board of Trustees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1221 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | adopted 34-0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, February 10, 2020 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules as a consent bill |
2020-01-30 | Senate | to Education (S) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | introduced in Senate |