KY SR136 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-23 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honor Albert B. Chandler Hospital and recognize April 24, 2022, as UK Albert B. Chandler Hospital Appreciation Day.
Title
A RESOLUTION honoring the 60th anniversary of the University of Kentucky Albert B. Chandler Hospital.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2022-02-22 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2022-02-18 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/22RS/sr136.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/22RS/sr136/orig_bill.pdf |