KY SR295 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-15 - adopted 18-16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-04-15 - adopted 18-16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Confirm the appointment of Mark A. Workman to the Board of Directors of Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance Authority for a term expiring December 31, 2023.
Title
A RESOLUTION confirming the appointment of Mark A. Workman to the Board of Directors of the Kentucky Employers' Mutual Insurance Authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1468 (Y: 18 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Senate | adopted 18-16 |
2020-04-14 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Consent Orders of the Day |
2020-04-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Tuesday, April 14, 2020 |
2020-03-26 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2020-03-19 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism, and Labor (S) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | introduced in Senate |