KY SR39 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Honor Representative Mark Hart for helping to save a five-year-old boy's life on September 8, 2019.
Title
A RESOLUTION honoring Representative Mark Hart for helping to save a five-year-old boy's life on September 8, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | adopted |
2020-01-15 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sr39.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sr39/orig_bill.pdf |