LA HB489 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-27 - Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to Medicaid services for maternal and infant health (EG GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to Medicaid services for maternal and infant health (EG GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported with amendments (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |
2024-03-01 | House | Prefiled. |