MA H1009 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4635
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to provide for primary and preventative health care services for certain children in the Commonwealth. Health Care Financing.
Title
Improving the Children's Medical Security Program and simplifying the administration process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4635 |
2015-07-17 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/22/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H4635 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2027 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1799 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied S1028
H1485 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S75 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - New draft substituted, see S2043
S529 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S568 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S628 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1188 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1169 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S88 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S66 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S72 (Similar To) 2015-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H2027 (Similar To) 2016-05-05 - Accompanied a study order, see H4242
H1799 (Similar To) 2016-03-24 - Accompanied S1028
H1485 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
S75 (Similar To) 2015-11-05 - New draft substituted, see S2043
S529 (Similar To) 2016-06-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2318
S676 (Similar To) 2016-01-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2099
S568 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S628 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1188 (Similar To) 2016-06-23 - Accompanied a study order, see S2356
S1169 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see S2199
S88 (Similar To) 2016-05-23 - Read; and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S66 (Similar To) 2016-06-02 - Accompanied a study order, see S2306
S72 (Similar To) 2015-07-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1009 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1009.pdf |