MA H1013 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4635
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4635
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to prohibit health care providers from attempting to recoup unreimbursed amounts paid by government payors by increasing charges to nongovernmental payors. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to prohibition on public-private cost shift
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4635 |
2015-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/03/2015 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in B-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H4635 (Replaced by) 2016-09-26 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H4736 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2016
H3048 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2615 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3321 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2159 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
H4736 (Similar To) 2017-01-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 420 of the Acts of 2016
H3048 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2615 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H3321 (Similar To) 2016-04-19 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H2159 (Similar To) 2016-09-15 - Accompanied a study order, see H4611
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1013 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1013.pdf |