MA H1045 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H4729
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to employment discrimination. Labor and Workforce Development.
Title
Relative to the Massachusetts Commission Against Discrimination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4729 |
2017-03-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/04/2017 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Labor and Workforce Development |
Same As/Similar To
H1897 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H2836 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1056 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H952 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H2836 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1056 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H952 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
H4729 (Replaced by) 2018-07-12 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1045 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1045.pdf |