MA H1050 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3768
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the establishment of a medical marijuana pilot program. Marijuana Policy.
Title
Relative to a medical marijuana pilot program
Sponsors
Rep. Geoff Diehl [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3768 |
2017-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A1 & A2 |
2017-03-31 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/03/2017 from 11:00 AM-05:00 PM in A1 & A2 |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Marijuana Policy |
Same As/Similar To
H2385 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H2386 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1058 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3201 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3202 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
H1748 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H3732 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
H2386 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H1058 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3201 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3202 (Similar To) 2017-06-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3768
H3768 (Replaced by) 2017-06-21 - Published as amended, see H3776
H1748 (Similar To) 2018-07-16 - Accompanied a study order, see H4684
H3732 (Similar To) 2018-06-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4585
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1050 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1050.pdf |