MA H1052 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4433
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4433
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H4433
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to include health care costs in the foundation budget for certain school districts. Education.
Title
Relative to updating Chapter 70 calculations to include health insurance premium costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-10 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4433 |
2011-04-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/07/2011 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Education |
Same As/Similar To
H4433 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1052 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11177&generalCourtId=1 |