MA H1052 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5311
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-06 - Accompanied a study order, see H5311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to banking laws and related statutes. Financial Services.
Title
Amending the banking laws and related statutes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-06 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5311 |
2022-05-31 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday June 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-05-02 | House | Reporting date extended to Tuesday May 31, 2022, pending concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday April 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H1140 (Similar To) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5311 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5311 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1052 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1052.pdf |