MA H1070 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to expanding motor vehicle insurance coverage options to include the diminished value of automobiles. Financial Services.
Title
Expanding automobile insurance coverage options to include the diminished value of automobiles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-03 | House | No further action taken |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2021-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/15/2021 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S719 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S661 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1185 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
S718 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S661 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
H1185 (Similar To) 2022-08-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5003
S718 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1070 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1070.pdf |