MA H1075 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-7)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-31 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to financial penalties of active duty military personnel withdrawing from postsecondary courses. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to students serving in the military
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Rules of the two branches, acting concurrently |
2013-05-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2013 from 10:30 AM-12:30 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Higher Education |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1075 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1075.pdf |