MA H108 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4454
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-09-11 - Accompanied a study order, see H4454
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to establishing minimum staffing levels for private sector human service agencies. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to ensuring safe staffing levels at private sector human service agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-11 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4454 |
2014-05-12 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the House Committee on Health Care Financing |
2013-07-10 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in B-1 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4454 (Replaced by) 2014-09-11 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H108 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H108.pdf |