MA H109 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4429
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 25-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4429
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-08-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4429
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relativerelative to the electronic benefits transfer (EBT) cash assistance program. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Relative to preventing fraud in the Massachusetts EBT cash assistance program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-08-28 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4429 |
2013-05-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/04/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
H4429 (Replaced by) 2014-08-28 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H109 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H109.pdf |