MA H1092 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4209
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-14 - Accompanied a study order, see H4209
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require persons seeking housing or assistance from the Executive Office of Housing and Economic Development to provide valid social security numbers. Housing.
Title
Relative to ensuring housing benefits for veterans
Sponsors
Rep. Geoff Diehl [R] | Rep. Marc Lombardo [R] | Rep. Shaunna O'Connell [R] | Rep. James Lyons [R] |
Rep. Kevin Kuros [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-14 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4209 |
2015-06-29 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/28/2015 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H4209 (Replaced by) 2016-04-14 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1092 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1092.pdf |