MA H11 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4004
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - New draft substituted, see H4004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-03 - New draft substituted, see H4004
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to Chapter 30B So much of the recommendations of the Office of the Inspector General (House, No. 8) as relates to Chapter 30B, the Uniform Procurement Law. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Relative to Chapter 30B
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-03 | House | New draft substituted, see H4004 |
2014-04-03 | House | Read second, amendment adopted (as recommended by the committee on House Ways and Means) |
2014-04-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2014-04-03 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading with the amendment pending |
2014-04-02 | House | Referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling with the amendment pending |
2014-04-02 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass with an amendment, substituting therefor a bill with the same title, see H4004 |
2013-10-21 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-06-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the House committee on Ways and Means |
2013-05-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/29/2013 from 11:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-1 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H4004 (Replaced by) 2014-04-03 - Ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H11 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H11.pdf |