MA H11 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-02 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Inspector General (House, No. 8) as relates to disabled persons’ parking placards. Transportation.
Title
Relative to disabled persons’ parking placards
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-02 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2016-05-02 | House | Rules suspended |
2016-05-02 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting |
2016-04-04 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2015-12-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 01/06/2016 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
H9 (Similar To) 2016-09-22 - Accompanied a study order, see H4624
H10 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H12 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H13 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H14 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3959
H10 (Similar To) 2016-04-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H12 (Similar To) 2016-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H4639
H13 (Similar To) 2016-03-21 - Accompanied a study order, see H4102
H14 (Similar To) 2016-01-25 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3959
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H11 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H11.pdf |