MA H11 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Replaces legislation H2714
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
So much of the recommendations of the Inspector General (House, No. 7) as relates to revising Chapter 30B, the Uniform Procurement Law. State Administration and Regulatory Oversight.
Title
Revising Chapter 30B
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-28 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-10-28 | House | Accompanied by H2714 |
2019-03-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/01/2019 from 01:00 PM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on State Administration and Regulatory Oversight |
Same As/Similar To
H10 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2755 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2714 (Replaces) 2019-10-28 - Accompanied H11
H2755 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
H2714 (Replaces) 2019-10-28 - Accompanied H11
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H11 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H11.pdf |