MA H1105 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish uniform enforcement and confidentiality provisions relative to certain licensees under the jurisdiction of the Division of Banks. Financial Services.
Title
Establishing uniform enforcement and confidentiality provisions relative to certain licensees under the jurisdiction of the Division of Banks
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2023-10-12 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/24/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1105 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1105.pdf |