MA H1124 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to encourage smart growth zoning and housing production. Housing.
Title
To encourage smart growth zoning and housing production
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Honan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-29 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2013-05-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/07/2013 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Housing |
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1124 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1124.pdf |