MA H1134 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Barrows of Mansfield, a petition of F. Jay Barrows and Shaunna L. O'Connell that the Executive Office of Health and Human Services produce annually lists of employers who have 50 or more employees using public health assistance. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to provide immediate relief to businesses on health care costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S1673 (Similar To) 2020-05-21 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2642 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H329 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
S85 (Similar To) 2020-12-29 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
S1809 (Similar To) 2019-12-04 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S543 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2543
S960 (Similar To) 2020-02-06 - Accompanied H1413
S2223 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Accompanied a study order, see S2533
S687 (Similar To) 2020-07-23 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H2642 (Similar To) 2020-11-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H5080
H329 (Similar To) 2020-10-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1134 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1134.pdf |