MA H1136 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to require insurance companies to reimburse licensed athletic trainers for certain services. Financial Services.
Title
Promoting consumer choice in health care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2023-09-14 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/26/2023 from 10:00 AM-01:00 PM in A-2 and virtual |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S603 (Similar To) 2024-05-06 - Accompanied a study order, see S2768
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1136 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1136.pdf |