MA H1137 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4463
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-10-04 - Accompanied a study order, see H4463
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to reimbursements to municipalities for property tax receipts from a coal-fired electric generating facilities by the Department of Environmental Protection . Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
To reimburse municipalities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-10-04 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4463 |
2012-01-04 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/25/2011 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in 437 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4463 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1137 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=12258&generalCourtId=1 |