MA H1140 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4528
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to direct the Department of Public Health to implement an institutional pharmacy discharge medication pilot program to ensure patient medication adherence. Public Health.
Title
To ensure patient medication adherence
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4528 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | House concurred |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Reporting date extended to Wednesday April 25, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-02-14 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-12-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 12/19/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
H1135 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H132 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2413
H621 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1186 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4681
H1215 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H1131 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H1133 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4682
H132 (Similar To) 2018-04-12 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2413
H621 (Similar To) 2018-05-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4528
H1186 (Similar To) 2018-07-02 - Accompanied a study order, see H4681
H1215 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1140 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1140.pdf |