MA H115 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5040
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5040
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the purchase and installation of wireless internet service in schools and public institutions of higher education. Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity.
Title
Relative to best management practices for wireless in schools and public institutions of higher education
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Dykema [D] | Rep. Kip Diggs [D] | Rep. Lindsay Sabadosa [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gordon [D] |
Sen. Joanne Comerford [D] | Rep. Dylan Fernandes [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-29 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5040 |
2021-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-09-30 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/13/2021 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Advanced Information Technology, the Internet and Cybersecurity |
Same As/Similar To
S2140 (Similar To) 2022-08-08 - Ought NOT to pass (under Joint Rule 10) and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session
H5040 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
H5040 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H115 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H115.pdf |