MA H1158 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Pending: Joint Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to protections and accountability for transportation network and delivery network companies workers, consumers, and communities. Financial Services.
Title
Establishing protections and accountability for TNC and DNC workers, consumers, and communities (EPA)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-08 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday July 31, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-10-31 | Joint | Hearing rescheduled to 11/06/2023 from 10:30 AM-06:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-10-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/06/2023 from 10:30 AM-06:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S627 (Similar To) 2024-03-28 - Senate concurred
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1158 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1158.pdf |