MA H1167 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4442
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4442
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the use of aqueducts owned by the Commonwealth for passive recreation. Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture.
Title
Relative to the public use of the Commonwealth's aqueducts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4442 |
2011-03-22 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/22/2011 from 11:00 AM-12:50 PM in B-1 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Environment, Natural Resources and Agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
H4442 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1167 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=10843&generalCourtId=1 |