MA H1168 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4749
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4749
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4749
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the collection of consumer debt. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to fairness in debt collection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4749 |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2022-02-03 | House | Reporting date extended to Saturday April 30, 2022, pending concurrence |
2021-10-13 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/26/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
S683 (Similar To) 2022-02-17 - Accompanied a study order, see S2700
S1813 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H2864 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3323 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1205 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2881
S645 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2219 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H4749 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S663 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2858
S2858 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1813 (Similar To) 2022-09-26 - Accompanied a study order, see H5247
H2864 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5043
H3323 (Similar To) 2022-08-29 - Accompanied a study order, see H5042
S1205 (Similar To) 2022-05-16 - Accompanied a study order, see S2881
S645 (Similar To) 2022-02-14 - Accompanied a study order, see S2693
S2219 (Similar To) 2022-02-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2711
H4749 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
S663 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2858
S2858 (Similar To) 2022-05-02 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1168 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1168.pdf |