MA H117 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4436
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-13 - Accompanied a study order, see H4436
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
By Mr. Scibak of South Hadley, a petition of John W. Scibak and Sean Garballey that telemarketers be required to use legitimate phone numbers so that consumers can directly communicate with solicitors. Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure.
Title
Relative to telemarketing solicitation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-13 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4436 |
2011-05-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/24/2011 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Consumer Protection and Professional Licensure |
Same As/Similar To
H4436 (Replaced by) 2013-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H117 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=9335&generalCourtId=1 |