MA H1171 | 2015-2016 | 189th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4706
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-24 - Accompanied a study order, see H4706
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish the Department of Mental Health as the oversight agency for the mental health system within the state prison system. The Judiciary.
Title
Relative to ensuring quality mental health services in state correctional facilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4706 |
2015-10-07 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/14/2015 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-1 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2015-01-20 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4706 (Replaced by) 2016-10-24 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H68 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H785 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H786 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H783 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H784 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H68 (Similar To) 2016-09-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H4613
H785 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H786 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H783 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
H784 (Similar To) 2016-03-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4111
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1171 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/189/H1171.pdf |