MA H1188 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4528
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-04 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to the Nurse Licensure Compact. Public Health.
Title
Relative to nurse licensure compact in Massachusetts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-04 | House | Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-01-01 | House | No further action taken |
2018-06-04 | House | Reported on a part of H4528 |
2018-05-24 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4528 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2018-04-24 | House | Reporting date extended to Wednesday May 16, 2018, pending concurrence |
2018-03-05 | House | Reported favorably by committee and referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
2017-05-25 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/06/2017 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in A-2 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Health |
Same As/Similar To
S1162 (Similar To) 2018-05-31 - Accompanied a study order, see S2535
S148 (Similar To) 2017-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2000 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2001 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1193 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3897 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2017
H28 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4351
H3954 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - See H3754
H3880 (Similar To) 2017-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2017
H4254 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
H4255 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
H4353 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4614 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2018
H4768 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2018
H4932 (Similar To) 2018-11-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4956
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
S148 (Similar To) 2017-07-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2000 (Similar To) 2018-02-12 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2001 (Similar To) 2017-06-29 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1915 (Similar To) 2018-01-05 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
H1193 (Similar To) 2018-06-18 - Accompanied a study order, see H4625
H3897 (Similar To) 2017-10-12 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 93 of the Acts of 2017
H28 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4351
H3954 (Similar To) 2017-10-16 - See H3754
H3880 (Similar To) 2017-09-15 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 80 of the Acts of 2017
H4254 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4429
H4255 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
H4353 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4528 (Replaced by) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4614 (Similar To) 2018-07-23 - Chapter 149 of the Acts of 2018
H4768 (Similar To) 2018-12-20 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 326 of the Acts of 2018
H4932 (Similar To) 2018-11-05 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4956
H4995 (Similar To) 2018-12-21 - Accompanied a new draft, see H5017
H5000 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H4999 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
H5001 (Similar To) 2019-01-01 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1188 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1188.pdf |