MA H1195 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence
Pending: Joint Health Care Financing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to chronic disease care self-management. Health Care Financing.
Title
Resolve providing for an investigation and study by a special commission relative to chronic disease care self-management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday December 31, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-04-30 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-04-29 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday June 19, 2020, pending concurrence |
2020-03-26 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2020-03-23 | House | Reporting date extended to Friday May 1, 2020, pending concurrence |
2019-03-27 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 04/11/2019 from 01:00 PM-04:00 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
H729 (Similar To) 2020-02-05 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H529 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2963 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H474 (Similar To) 2020-07-28 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
H1248 (Similar To) 2020-12-23 - Accompanied a study order, see H5209
H1262 (Similar To) 2020-09-28 - Accompanied a study order, see H4974
H529 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4430
H2478 (Similar To) 2020-11-19 - Accompanied a study order, see H5128
H2963 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - Senate concurred
S324 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S1439 (Similar To) 2020-05-26 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H474 (Similar To) 2020-07-28 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H560 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S2052 (Similar To) 2020-04-27 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1195 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1195.pdf |