MA H1207 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5167
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to increase maximum liabilities of annuity benefit insurance payable by the Massachusetts Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association. Financial Services.
Title
Relative to annuity benefit insurance
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Smola [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5167 |
2021-10-08 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 10/20/2021 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Financial Services |
Same As/Similar To
H5167 (Replaced by) 2023-01-03 - No further action taken
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1207 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1207.pdf |