MA H1238 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4421
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4421
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to establish an early college education program to increase postsecondary completion rates and participation in career pathways. Higher Education.
Title
Relative to early college high schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H4421 |
2019-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/13/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H518 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
H434 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S304 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S286 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S239 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S760 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
H4421 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H434 (Similar To) 2020-12-03 - Accompanied a study order, see H5159
S304 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S286 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S731 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S239 (Similar To) 2020-02-18 - Accompanied a study order, see S2538
S760 (Similar To) 2020-06-04 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2737
H4421 (Replaced by) 2020-02-20 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1238 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1238.pdf |