MA H1243 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H5125
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-25 - Accompanied a study order, see H5125
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to adjunct faculty wages. Higher Education.
Title
To ensure minimum fair wages and employment stability for adjunct faculty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-25 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H5125 |
2019-05-23 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/11/2019 from 10:30 AM-01:30 PM in A-1 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Higher Education |
Same As/Similar To
H1695 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H24 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1666 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1104 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1059 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S2162 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H1599 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1618 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4170
H1671 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3963 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
H5125 (Replaced by) 2020-11-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H24 (Similar To) 2020-02-24 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1666 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
S1104 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S1059 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2548
S2162 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Accompanied a study order, see S2551
H1599 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H1618 (Similar To) 2019-11-06 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4170
H1671 (Similar To) 2020-11-10 - Accompanied a study order, see H5123
H3963 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a new draft, see H4464
H5125 (Replaced by) 2020-11-25 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1243 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1243.pdf |