MA H1250 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to accessory dwelling units. Housing.
Title
Relative to accessory dwelling units
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2019-12-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2019-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1282 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S820 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S788 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1277 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
S820 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Rules
S788 (Similar To) 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
H1277 (Similar To) 2020-01-13 - Read second and ordered to a third reading
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1250 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1250.pdf |