MA H1250 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S799
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied S799
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Accompanied S799
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to advance health equity and to establish a secretary of equity. Health Care Financing.
Title
To advance health equity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Accompanied S799 |
2023-08-28 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/20/2023 from 10:00 AM-03:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S799 (Replaced by) 2024-04-08 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1716 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Accompanied S1694
S646 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S741 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
S1358 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2733
S1716 (Similar To) 2024-03-07 - Accompanied S1694
S646 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Committee recommended ought to pass and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S741 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
S1358 (Similar To) 2024-04-22 - Accompanied a study order, see S2733
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1250 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H1250.pdf |