MA H128 | 2023-2024 | 193rd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4872
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4872
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4872
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to ensuring equal access to medical treatments essential for people with a developmental disability, intellectual disability, or autism. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Ensuring equal access to medical treatments essential for people with a developmental disability, intellectual disability, or autism
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4872 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2024-02-05 | House | Reporting date extended to Thursday May 2, 2024, pending concurrence |
2023-06-20 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 06/27/2023 from 09:00 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2023-02-16 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
Same As/Similar To
S658 (Similar To) 2024-04-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1094 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H3625 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
H4872 (Replaced by) 2024-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
S1094 (Similar To) 2024-02-08 - Accompanied a study order, see S2612
H3625 (Similar To) 2024-05-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4634
H4872 (Replaced by) 2024-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H128 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/193/H128.pdf |