MA H1282 | 2017-2018 | 190th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4767
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-17 - Accompanied a study order, see H4767
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to clarify the definition of violent crimes in the law relative to firearm sales. Public Safety and Homeland Security.
Title
To clarify the definition of a "violent crime" in Chapter 140
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-17 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4767 |
2017-11-06 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 11/16/2017 from 11:00 AM-03:00 PM in A-1 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2017-01-23 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Same As/Similar To
S770 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H3075 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H726 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1405 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S826 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H4767 (Replaced by) 2018-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
H3075 (Similar To) 2017-10-02 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2170
H726 (Similar To) 2018-08-09 - Accompanied a study order, see H4874
S1405 (Similar To) 2018-01-18 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S826 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Accompanied a study order, see S2313
H4767 (Replaced by) 2018-07-17 - Discharged to the committee on House Rules
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1282 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/190/H1282.pdf |