MA H1285 | 2019-2020 | 191st General Court
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-23 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to single-family home construction. Housing.
Title
Relative to single-family home construction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-23 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means |
2019-05-02 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 from 10:00 AM-02:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Housing |
Same As/Similar To
H1371 (Similar To) 2020-11-12 - Accompanied a study order, see H5081
H1624 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2665 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H374 (Similar To) 2020-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2763 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1885 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1902 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1364 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
H1624 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2665 (Similar To) 2019-10-28 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H374 (Similar To) 2020-07-22 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
H2763 (Similar To) 2020-02-13 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1885 (Similar To) 2019-09-16 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S1989 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Accompanied H2827
H2827 (Similar To) 2019-07-15 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Ways and Means
S1902 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
S1364 (Similar To) 2020-01-09 - Discharged to the committee on Senate Rules
S79 (Similar To) 2020-04-09 - Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on Senate Ways and Means
S2320 (Similar To) 2020-02-27 - Accompanied a study order, see S2569
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1285 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/191/H1285.pdf |