MA H1288 | 2013-2014 | 188th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H4218
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on August 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on August 18 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-06 - No further action taken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to authorize the city of Lawrence to establish a program for enforcement against illegal dumping. The Judiciary. [Local Approval Received.]
Title
Authorizing the city of Lawrence to establish a program for enforcement against illegal dumping
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-06 | Senate | No further action taken |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read and placed in the Orders of the Day for the next session |
2014-08-18 | House | Read third, ameded and passed to be engrossed |
2014-07-16 | House | Read second and ordered to a third reading |
2014-07-14 | House | Committee reported that the matter be placed in the Orders of the Day for the next sitting for a second reading |
2014-07-03 | House | Bill reported favorably by committee and referred to the committee on House Steering, Policy and Scheduling |
2014-06-26 | House | Discharged to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
2014-06-26 | House | Reported on a part of H4218 |
2014-06-26 | House | Reported from the committee on House Rules |
2014-06-26 | House | Accompanied a study order, see H4218 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2014-03-20 | House | Reporting date extended to Monday June 30, 2014, pending concurrence |
2013-07-09 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 07/09/2013 from 01:00 PM-05:00 PM in Gardner Auditorium |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2013-01-22 | House | Referred to the House Committee on The Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
H4218 (Replaced by) 2014-07-03 - Reported, in part, by H1590
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/188/House/H1288 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Document/Bill/188/House/H1288.pdf |