MA H1294 | 2011-2012 | 187th General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by H3492
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3492
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-09 - Accompanied a new draft, see H3492
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Relative to court proceedings and services provided to certain children. Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities.
Title
Regarding families and children engaged in services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-09 | House | Accompanied a new draft, see H3492 |
2011-03-21 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2011-03-17 | House | Discharged to the Joint Committee on Children, Families and Persons with Disabilities |
2011-03-16 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 03/29/2011 from 10:30 AM-01:00 PM in B-2 |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2011-01-24 | House | Referred to Joint Committee on The Judiciary |
2011-01-24 | Senate | Senate concurs |
Same As/Similar To
H3492 (Replaced by) 2011-07-14 - New draft substituted as amended, see S1963
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/187/House/H1294 |
Text | http://www.malegislature.gov/Bills/PDF?billId=11914&generalCourtId=1 |