MA H1297 | 2021-2022 | 192nd General Court
Note: Legislation replaced by S2583
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2583
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2583
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
For legislation to extend MassHealth standard coverage to pregnant and postpartum residents of the Commonwealth. Health Care Financing.
Title
Relative to expanding equitable access to maternal postpartum care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-17 | Senate | Accompanied a new draft, see S2583 |
2021-08-24 | Joint | Hearing scheduled for 09/14/2021 from 11:00 AM-02:00 PM in Virtual Hearing |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate concurred |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to the Joint Committee on Health Care Financing |
Same As/Similar To
S799 (Similar To) 2021-11-17 - Accompanied a new draft, see S2583
S2583 (Replaced by) 2022-03-03 - New draft substituted, see S2731
S2731 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 436 of the Acts of 2022
S2583 (Replaced by) 2022-03-03 - New draft substituted, see S2731
S2731 (Similar To) 2023-01-05 - Signed by the Governor, Chapter 436 of the Acts of 2022
Massachusetts State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1297 |
Text | https://malegislature.gov/Bills/192/H1297.pdf |